MN SF495 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Author added Duckworth
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Author added Duckworth
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Former landfills schools construction prohibition
Title
Former landfills schools construction prohibition
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Author added Kunesh |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Author added Housley |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF807 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Author added Edelson