MN HF807 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Author added Edelson
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School construction near former landfill prohibited, and schools located near former landfill notice required.
Title
School construction near former landfill prohibited, and schools located near former landfill notice required.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Dean Urdahl [R] | Rep. Greg Boe [R] | Rep. Kaela Berg [D] |
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Author added Edelson |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
2021-03-22 | House | Author added Berg |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF495 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Author added Duckworth