MN SF4780 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation network companies regulations provisions
Title
Transportation network companies regulations provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Omar Fateh [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Author stricken Mohamed |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Commerce and Consumer Protection |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Author added Mohamed |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Labor |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4746 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Joint rule 2.03 waived