MN SF4745 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-29 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4661, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-29 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4661, SF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Workers' compensation hearing provisions modifications
Title
Workers' compensation hearing provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Jen McEwen [D] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Gene Dornink [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF4661, SF indefinitely postponed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Author added Dornink |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Labor |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4661 (Similar To) 2024-05-08 - Secretary of State Chapter 97