MN SF465 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Limmer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Author added Limmer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restrictive covenants related to protected classes discharge provisions; real property recording and filing conveyances statutory short form creation
Title
Restrictive covenants related to protected classes discharge provisions; real property recording and filing conveyances statutory short form creation
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] | Sen. Bobby Champion [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Steve Cwodzinski [D] |
Sen. Warren Limmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Author added Limmer |
2019-03-04 | Senate | HF substituted in committee HF51 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Author added Cwodzinski |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF51 (Similar To) 2019-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 45