MN SF4554 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-17 - Author added Champion
Pending: Senate E-12 Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Gifted and talented programs increase funding and provisions modification

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gifted and talented programs increase funding and provisions modification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-17SenateAuthor added Champion
2020-05-13SenateAuthor added Jensen
2020-05-06SenateAuthor added Westrom
2020-05-04SenateReferred to E-12 Finance and Policy
2020-05-04SenateIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback