MN SF450 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pollution control agency motor vehicle emissions standards authority repeal
Title
Pollution control agency motor vehicle emissions standards authority repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] | Sen. Mark Johnson [R] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. John Jasinski [R] |
Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Author added Pratt |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authors added Johnson; Utke; Jasinski |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF395 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Author added Rasmusson