MN SF4427 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Xiong
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Author added Xiong
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
City of Cannon Falls American Veterans Memorial Park appropriation
Title
City of Cannon Falls American Veterans Memorial Park appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Mitchell [D] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Steve Drazkowski [R] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] |
Sen. Tou Xiong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Author added Xiong |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Author added Drazkowski |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4284 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Authors added Hudson and Altendorf