MN SF421 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Natural Gas Innovation Act
Title
Natural Gas Innovation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 53 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Author added Hoffman |
2021-05-06 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
2021-05-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Special Order |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Author added Frentz |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF239 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means