MN HF239 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Natural Gas Innovation Act established, and natural gas utilities encouraged to develop innovative resources, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Natural Gas Innovation Act established, and natural gas utilities encouraged to develop innovative resources, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2021-03-18 | House | Author stricken Boe |
2021-03-01 | House | Author added Boe |
2021-01-28 | House | Author added Bierman |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Climate and Energy Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF421 (Similar To) 2021-05-10 - Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Ways and Means