MN SF4110 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Highways for habitat program establishment and appropriation
Title
Highways for habitat program establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Author added Coleman |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4313 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Author added Hornstein