MN SF4103 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disabled veterans property tax market value exclusion modification by increasing exclusion amount for totally and permanently disabled veterans authorization
Title
Disabled veterans property tax market value exclusion modification by increasing exclusion amount for totally and permanently disabled veterans authorization
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Newton [D] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] |
Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Authors added Klein; Duckworth |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4396 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Author added Freiberg