MN SF4098 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Release of certain information on leased motor vehicles to licensed motor vehicle dealers provision and technical changes provision
Title
Release of certain information on leased motor vehicles to licensed motor vehicle dealers provision and technical changes provision
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Transportation |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4104 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means