MN SF4039 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - Author added Dziedzic
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Certain statutes regarding public safety and corrections amendment and appropriation
Title
Certain statutes regarding public safety and corrections amendment and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Author added Isaacson |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Chief author added Latz |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Bigham |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4608 (Similar To) 2022-04-27 - HF indefinitely postponed