MN SF4019 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4366
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-26 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4366
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus agriculture, housing, and broadband policy and supplemental appropriations
Title
Omnibus agriculture, housing, and broadband policy and supplemental appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4366 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Author added Draheim |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4366 (Similar To) 2022-05-04 - Senate conferees Westrom; Draheim; Dornink; Pratt; Dziedzic