MN SF3999 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Guarantee victim-identifying supporting documentation submitted by medical service provider to sexual assault exam payment program is classified private data
Title
Guarantee victim-identifying supporting documentation submitted by medical service provider to sexual assault exam payment program is classified private data
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Chief author added Oumou Verbeten |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Gustafson |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Author added Kunesh |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4019 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Second reading