MN SF3885 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Senate file first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - Senate file first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Certain insurers authorization to offer paid family leave insurance benefits
Title
Certain insurers authorization to offer paid family leave insurance benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Julia Coleman [R] | Sen. Eric Pratt [R] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Gary Dahms [R] |
Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2022-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4326 (Similar To) 2022-03-23 - Author added Boe