MN SF3881 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designating a portion of marked U.S. Highway 169 between Marble and Mountain Iron as "Senator David J. Tomassoni Memorial Cross Range Expressway"
Title
Designating a portion of marked U.S. Highway 169 between Marble and Mountain Iron as "Senator David J. Tomassoni Memorial Cross Range Expressway"
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Farnsworth [R] | Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. John Jasinski [R] |
Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - House: S.F. NO. 3881 (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2024-05-02 | Governor approval | |
2024-05-02 | Secretary of State Chapter 98 | |
2024-05-02 | Governor's action Approval | |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Returned from House |
2024-05-01 | Presented to Governor | |
2024-05-01 | House | Bill was passed |
2024-05-01 | House | Third reading |
2024-05-01 | House | Second reading |
2024-05-01 | House | Rules suspended, urgency declared |
2024-05-01 | House | Senate file first reading |
2024-05-01 | House | Received from Senate |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Special Order |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Author added Dziedzic |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4237 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Second reading