MN SF3853 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2665
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-19 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2665
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Certain emancipated minors permission to seek harassment restraining orders on their own behalf
Title
Certain emancipated minors permission to seek harassment restraining orders on their own behalf
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2665 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2665 (Similar To) 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State Chapter 82