MN SF3848 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Author added Mathews
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Author added Mathews
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Human Rights Act modification
Title
Minnesota Human Rights Act modification
Sponsors
Sen. Warren Limmer [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Sen. Michael Kreun [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] |
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Author added Mathews |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Author added Gruenhagen |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3926 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Second reading pursuant to House rule 4.31