MN SF3820 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-04 - Author added Champion
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-04 - Author added Champion
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child maltreatment reporting systems review required to be completed by Commissioner of human services provision
Title
Child maltreatment reporting systems review required to be completed by Commissioner of human services provision
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Author added Champion |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Author added Mitchell |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3781 (Similar To) 2024-02-14 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Children and Families Finance and Policy