MN SF3610 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Author added Hawj
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-09 - Author added Hawj
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requirement elimination for new Minnesota Residents to take driver's license written knowledge examination
Title
Requirement elimination for new Minnesota Residents to take driver's license written knowledge examination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | Senate | Author added Hawj |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Author added Pratt |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4259 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy