MN SF3576 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-02 - Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
White Bear Lake water sustainability study and augmentation design project appropriation; Vadnais Heights projects protections establishment
Title
White Bear Lake water sustainability study and augmentation design project appropriation; Vadnais Heights projects protections establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Wiger [D] | Sen. LeRoy Stumpf [D] | Sen. David Tomassoni [I] | Sen. Tom Saxhaug [D] |
Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Capital Investment |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Author added Chamberlain |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Energy |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3976 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance