MN SF3564 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 68 03/17/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 68 03/17/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disaster contingency account transfer
Title
Disaster contingency account transfer
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Miller [R] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Nick Frentz [D] | Sen. Mike Goggin [R] |
Sen. Eric Pratt [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House: Passage (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Secretary of State Chapter 68 03/17/2020 | |
2020-03-26 | Governor's action Approval 03/17/2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-03-17 | Governor approval | |
2020-03-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Returned from House |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-03-12 | House | Third reading |
2020-03-11 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-03-05 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3633 |
2020-03-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3633 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Author added Sandstede