MN SF3541 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pensions and retirement appropriations bill
Title
Pensions and retirement appropriations bill
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Senate | Comm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4016 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections