MN SF3538 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expedited rulemaking authorization to modify the State Building Code to allow a single exit stairway to serve multifamily residential structures under certain circumstances
Title
Expedited rulemaking authorization to modify the State Building Code to allow a single exit stairway to serve multifamily residential structures under certain circumstances
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Port [D] | Sen. Omar Fateh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State and Local Government and Veterans |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Author added Fateh |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Labor |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3351 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Author added Kozlowski