MN SF3483 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-20 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 22, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-20 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 22, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Court reporter outdated statutes update; probate or civil commitment court proceedings referee orders and decrees court of appeals direct appeals authorization; perjury penalty statutes clarification
Title
Court reporter outdated statutes update; probate or civil commitment court proceedings referee orders and decrees court of appeals direct appeals authorization; perjury penalty statutes clarification
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-20 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 22, 2016. |
2016-05-19 | House | Second reading |
2016-05-19 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2016-05-18 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 3005 |
2016-05-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 56-0 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Special Order |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3005 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - HF indefinitely postponed