MN SF3463 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Governor veto
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Liability and joint and severable liability for trespass to critical infrastructure establishment; recruiting or educating individuals to trespass on or damage critical infrastructure crime establishment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liability and joint and severable liability for trespass to critical infrastructure establishment; recruiting or educating individuals to trespass on or damage critical infrastructure crime establishment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-19 - House - House: Passage (Y: 77 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30 Governor veto
2018-05-30 Governor's action Veto Chapter 197
2018-05-21 Presented to Governor
2018-05-19SenateReturned from House
2018-05-19HouseBill was passed vote: 77-46
2018-05-19HouseThird reading
2018-05-17HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Saturday, May 19, 2018
2018-05-09HouseSecond reading
2018-05-09HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2018-05-08HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3693
2018-05-08HouseReceived from Senate
2018-05-07SenateThird reading Passed vote: 37-28
2018-05-07SenateSpecial Order
2018-04-09SenateAuthor added Eichorn
2018-04-09SenateAuthor stricken Limmer
2018-04-09SenateSecond reading
2018-04-09SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2018-03-19SenateAuthor added Tomassoni
2018-03-15SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2018-03-15SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3693 (Similar To) 2018-05-09 - HF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback