MN HF3693 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Trespass to critical infrastructure liability and vicarious liability created, and crime for recruiting or educating individuals to trespass on or damage critical infrastructure created.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trespass to critical infrastructure liability and vicarious liability created, and crime for recruiting or educating individuals to trespass on or damage critical infrastructure created.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09HouseHF indefinitely postponed
2018-05-09HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3463
2018-04-16HouseAuthor added Heintzeman.
2018-03-29HouseAuthor added Lohmer.
2018-03-29HouseSecond reading
2018-03-29HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2018-03-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance
2018-03-14HouseAuthor added Lueck.
2018-03-12HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF3463 (Similar To) 2018-05-30 - Governor veto

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback