MN SF3420 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-19 - Authors added Mathews; Koran; Draheim
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Workers compensation provisions modification; hospital outpatient fee schedule; outpatient billing, payment and dispute resolution; ambulatory surgical centers; workers compensation benefits

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers compensation provisions modification; hospital outpatient fee schedule; outpatient billing, payment and dispute resolution; ambulatory surgical centers; workers compensation benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-19SenateAuthors added Mathews; Koran; Draheim
2018-05-18SenateAuthor added Goggin
2018-05-16SenateRule 45; subst. General Orders HF3873
2018-05-14SenateSecond reading
2018-05-14SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2018-03-19SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2018-03-15SenateReferred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy
2018-03-15SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3873 (Similar To) 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 185

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback