MN HF3873 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-20 - Secretary of State Chapter 185
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Workers' Compensation Advisory Council recommendations adopted; workers' compensation provisions modified; hospital outpatient fee schedules modified; billing, payment, and dispute resolution modified; ambulatory surgical center payments defined; and covered benefits modified.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation Advisory Council recommendations adopted; workers' compensation provisions modified; hospital outpatient fee schedules modified; billing, payment, and dispute resolution modified; ambulatory surgical center payments defined; and covered benefits modified.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-20 Secretary of State Chapter 185
2018-05-20 Governor's action Approval
2018-05-20 Secretary of State, Filed
2018-05-20 Governor approval
2018-05-18 Presented to Governor
2018-05-17HouseReturned from Senate
2018-05-17SenateThird reading Passed vote: 61-0
2018-05-17SenateSpecial Order
2018-05-16SenateSecond reading
2018-05-16SenateComm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3420
2018-05-15SenateReferred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3420, now on General Orders
2018-05-15SenateIntroduction and first reading
2018-05-15SenateReceived from House
2018-05-15HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 127-0
2018-05-15HouseThird reading as amended
2018-05-15HouseAmended
2018-05-10HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 15, 2018
2018-05-03HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 07, 2018
2018-04-18HouseSecond reading
2018-04-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2018-04-09HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2018-03-29HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance
2018-03-21HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
2018-03-15HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform

Same As/Similar To

SF3420 (Similar To) 2018-05-19 - Authors added Mathews; Koran; Draheim

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF3873&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3873&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3873&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3873&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF3873&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF3873&session_number=0&year=2017&id=567
Roll Callhttp://www.senate.leg.state.mn.us/journals/gotopage.php?session=ls90&number=9271

Bill Comments

feedback