MN SF3411 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3819
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-10 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3819
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ramsey soil and water conservation district discontinuance and duties transfer to the Ramsey county board of commissioners
Title
Ramsey soil and water conservation district discontinuance and duties transfer to the Ramsey county board of commissioners
Sponsors
Sen. Carolyn Laine [D] | Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] | Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3819 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3819 (Similar To) 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 169