MN SF339 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Author added Clausen
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - Author added Clausen
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Office of ombudsman for common interest communities establishment
Title
Office of ombudsman for common interest communities establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Author added Metzen |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1959 (Similar To) 2015-03-17 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Civil Law and Data Practices