MN SF335 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - Author added Eken
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-15 - Author added Eken
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Knowing euthanasia of pet or companion animals with nonanesthetic gas at certain facilities prohibition
Title
Knowing euthanasia of pet or companion animals with nonanesthetic gas at certain facilities prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. John Marty [D] |
Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-15 | Senate | Author added Eken |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authors added Nelson; Draheim; Marty |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF1852 (Similar To) 2021-03-22 - Author added Hornstein