MN SF3301 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Author added Dornink
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-02 - Author added Dornink
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Freedom Flag designation as an official symbol of the state's commitment to remembering the American lives lost as a result of the terrorist attacks for September 11, 2001; display of the flag on certain days in public locations encouragement
Title
Freedom Flag designation as an official symbol of the state's commitment to remembering the American lives lost as a result of the terrorist attacks for September 11, 2001; display of the flag on certain days in public locations encouragement
Sponsors
Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] | Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] |
Sen. Gene Dornink [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Author added Dornink |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3460 (Similar To) 2022-02-15 - Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections