MN SF323 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Motion did not prevail To withdraw from committee and place on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Motion did not prevail To withdraw from committee and place on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment providing for gender equality under the law
Title
Constitutional amendment providing for gender equality under the law
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] | Sen. Bobby Champion [D] | Sen. Chris Eaton [D] | Sen. Steve Cwodzinski [D] |
Sen. Susan Kent [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail To withdraw from committee and place on General Orders (Y: 30 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail To withdraw from committee and place on General Orders (Y: 32 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail To withdraw from committee and place on General Orders (Y: 32 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion did not prevail To withdraw from committee and place on General Orders |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Motion did not prevail To withdraw from committee and place on General Orders |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Authors added Champion; Eaton; Cwodzinski; Kent |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF406 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Author added Morrison