MN SF3226 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Third-party programs and third-party testers to conduct behind-the-wheel road tests for class D drivers licenses; requirements and criteria specified; audits requirements; appeals of decisions made by commissioner of public safety authorization
Title
Third-party programs and third-party testers to conduct behind-the-wheel road tests for class D drivers licenses; requirements and criteria specified; audits requirements; appeals of decisions made by commissioner of public safety authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Dan Hall [R] | Sen. Paul T. Anderson [R] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] |
Sen. Jerry Relph [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Comm report: Amend previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended; re-refer to Finance |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3932 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation Finance and Policy Division