MN SF3201 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Mitchell
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Author added Mitchell
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Tenants right to organize and penalties for retaliation for tenant organizing authorization
Title
Tenants right to organize and penalties for retaliation for tenant organizing authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Author added Mitchell |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Homelessness Prevention |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2704 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Author added Youakim