MN SF3124 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - House: Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-06 - House: Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small city energy efficiency grant program inclusion of commercial buildings
Title
Small city energy efficiency grant program inclusion of commercial buildings
Sponsors
Sen. Rod Skoe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | House: Second reading | |
2010-04-06 | House: Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register | |
2010-03-29 | House: Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3473 | |
2010-03-29 | House: Received from Senate | |
2010-03-29 | Senate: Calendar: Third reading Passed | |
2010-03-24 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-22 | Senate: Comm report: To pass | |
2010-03-18 | Senate: Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government Operations and Oversight | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Referred to Energy, Utilities, Technology and Communications |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=Senate&f=SF3124&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/data/senate/bills/ls86/3100/S3124.0.pdf |