MN SF3062 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Authors added Maye Quade; Mann
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Authors added Maye Quade; Mann
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HIV/AIDS support services appropriation
Title
HIV/AIDS support services appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Clare Oumou Verbeten [D] | Sen. Liz Boldon [D] | Sen. Erin Maye Quade [D] |
Sen. Alice Mann [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Authors added Maye Quade; Mann |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Author added Boldon |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2568 (Similar To) 2023-04-03 - Author added Olson, L.