MN SF3008 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-22 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Liquor Bill
Title
Omnibus Liquor Bill
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - House - House: S.F. NO. 3008 (Y: 111 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 85 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - House - House: Passage, as amended (Y: 85 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-22 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 86 | |
2022-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-05-21 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-21 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2022-05-20 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference |
2022-05-20 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2022-05-20 | House | Motion prevailed |
2022-05-20 | House | Motion to adopt conference committee report |
2022-05-20 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2022-05-20 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Third reading |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2022-05-16 | Senate | House conferees Stephenson; Olson, L; Wolgamott; Kotyza-Witthuhn; Nash |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Senate conferees Dahms; Housley; Jasinski; Utke; Kent |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2022-05-12 | House | House conferees Stephenson; Olson, L.; Wolgamott; Kotyza-Witthuhn; Nash |
2022-05-12 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 5 to be appointed |
2022-05-12 | House | Senate conferees Dahms, Housley, Jasinski, Utke, and Kent |
2022-05-12 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 5 requested |
2022-05-11 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2022-05-11 | House | Third reading as amended |
2022-05-11 | House | Amended |
2022-05-09 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 11, 2022 |
2022-05-06 | House | Second reading |
2022-05-06 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2022-05-05 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF2767 |
2022-05-05 | House | Received from Senate |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2767 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Author added Becker-Finn