MN SF2984 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lottery retailers compensation and commissions provisions modification
Title
Lottery retailers compensation and commissions provisions modification
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [D] | Sen. David Tomassoni [I] | Sen. Anthony Lourey [D] |
Sen. Justin Eichorn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3623 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Author added Lillie.