MN HF3623 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Lillie.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Lillie.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Lottery retailer compensation set in law.
Title
Lottery retailer compensation set in law.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Bliss [R] | Rep. Jason Metsa [D] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. Jim Nash [R] |
Rep. Bob Gunther [R] | Rep. Joshua Heintzeman [R] | Rep. Ben Lien [D] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Lillie. |
2018-03-29 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2018-03-15 | House | Author added Ecklund. |
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Lueck. |
2018-03-12 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2984 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance