MN SF2980 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Senate: Author stricken Johnson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-23 - Senate: Author stricken Johnson
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State and local government financing provisions modification; school districts current year aid payment percentage reductions; sales tax rate reduction and rate of adjustment proportion calculation requirement; commissioner of revenue rate adjustments and tracking requirements; transportation sales and use tax rate reduction; county sales and use tax rate reduction; clothing sales tax exemption repeal
Title
State and local government financing provisions modification; school districts current year aid payment percentage reductions; sales tax rate reduction and rate of adjustment proportion calculation requirement; commissioner of revenue rate adjustments and tracking requirements; transportation sales and use tax rate reduction; county sales and use tax rate reduction; clothing sales tax exemption repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Bakk [I] | Sen. Terri Bonoff [D] | Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. LeRoy Stumpf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | Senate: Author stricken Johnson | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Authors added Bonoff; Stumpf | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Authors added Johnson; Rest | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-03-04 | Senate: Referred to Finance |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=Senate&f=SF2980&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/data/senate/bills/ls86/2900/S2980.0.pdf |