MN SF2895 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Johnson
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Author added Johnson
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Licensed physical therapists authority to provide a medical statement for parking privileges for physically handicapped persons establishment
Title
Licensed physical therapists authority to provide a medical statement for parking privileges for physically handicapped persons establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Author added Johnson |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3056 (Similar To) 2018-04-24 - Author added Uglem.