MN HF3056 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Author added Uglem.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Author added Uglem.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Licensed physical therapists authorized to provide a medical statement for parking privileges for physically disabled persons.
Title
Licensed physical therapists authorized to provide a medical statement for parking privileges for physically disabled persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Author added Uglem. |
2018-03-22 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-03-21 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2018-03-19 | House | Author added Freiberg. |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Reform |
2018-03-14 | House | Author added Petersburg. |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Sandstede. |
2018-03-01 | House | Authors added Backer, Pierson, Kunesh-Podein, Poston, and Clark. |
2018-02-26 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Transportation and Regional Governance Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2895 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Author added Johnson