MN SF2865 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 130 05/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Secretary of State Chapter 130 05/11/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Physician assistant advisory council members term limits elimination
Title
Physician assistant advisory council members term limits elimination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - House - House: Passage (Y: 123 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Secretary of State Chapter 130 05/11/18 | |
2018-05-14 | Governor's action Approval 05/11/18 | |
2018-05-11 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-11 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-08 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Returned from House |
2018-05-07 | House | Bill was passed vote: 123-3 |
2018-05-07 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, May 07, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-05-02 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3536 |
2018-05-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 67-0 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Special Order |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3536 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - HF indefinitely postponed