MN SF2771 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Eken
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Eken
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reimbursement rates modification for disability waiver services
Title
Reimbursement rates modification for disability waiver services
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Greg Clausen [D] | Rep. Jerry Newton [D] |
Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Author added Eken |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Author added Newton |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Author added Clausen |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3100 (Similar To) 2022-05-03 - Author added Boe