MN SF2764 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-22 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-22 - Governor approval
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Hennepin county select construction projects job order contracting use authorization and county energy forward pricing provisions modifications
Title
Hennepin county select construction projects job order contracting use authorization and county energy forward pricing provisions modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - House - House: Passage (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-22 | Governor approval | |
2016-05-22 | Secretary of State Chapter 151 | |
2016-05-22 | Governor's action Approval | |
2016-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Returned from House |
2016-05-19 | House | Bill was passed vote: 131-2 |
2016-05-19 | House | Third reading |
2016-05-17 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | House | Second reading |
2016-05-11 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2016-05-09 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF 2932 |
2016-05-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 46-17 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Second reading |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Referred to State and Local Government |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2932 (Similar To) 2016-05-11 - HF indefinitely postponed