MN SF2763 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Authors added Gustafson; Kupec; Miller
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Authors added Gustafson; Kupec; Miller
Pending: Senate Rules and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grants appropriation to Minnesota dairy farmers
Title
Grants appropriation to Minnesota dairy farmers
Sponsors
Sen. Aric Putnam [D] | Sen. Jordan Rasmusson [R] | Sen. Heather Gustafson [D] | Sen. Rob Kupec [D] |
Sen. Jeremy Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Authors added Gustafson; Kupec; Miller |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Joint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Author added Rasmusson |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Broadband, and Rural Development |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2861 (Similar To) 2023-03-27 - Author added Pursell